California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB361 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 1, 2015

Amended

Bill September 3, 2015
Bill May 28, 2015
Bill April 29, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015