LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB361
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB361
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB361
Compare Versions
AB361 Chaptered October 1, 2015
AB361 Enrolled September 16, 2015
AB361 Amended September 3, 2015
AB361 Amended May 28, 2015
AB361 Amended April 29, 2015
AB361 Amended March 26, 2015
AB361 Introduced February 17, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB361 Chaptered October 1, 2015
AB361 Enrolled September 16, 2015
AB361 Amended September 3, 2015
AB361 Amended May 28, 2015
AB361 Amended April 29, 2015
AB361 Amended March 26, 2015
AB361 Introduced February 17, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare