|
10/07/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 550, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/17/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 28. Page 2990.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 13. Page 3009.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 2586.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 13. Page 1775.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/01/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|