California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB40 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 10/07/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 40CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 550 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE OCTOBER 7, 2015 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR OCTOBER 7, 2015 PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 8, 2015 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 9, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 2, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 15, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Ting and Levine (Coauthors: Assembly Members Baker, Chiu, Dodd, Lackey, and Mark Stone) (Coauthors: Senators Anderson, Hill, Leno, McGuire, Nguyen, and Wolk) DECEMBER 1, 2014 An act to add and repeal Sections 27567, 30114, and 30814 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 40, Ting. Toll bridges: pedestrians and bicycles. Existing law provides for the construction and operation of various toll bridges by the state, the Golden Gate Bridge, Highway and Transportation District, and private entities that have entered into a franchise agreement with the state. This bill would, until January 1, 2021, prohibit a toll from being imposed on the passage of a pedestrian or bicycle over these various toll bridges. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 27567 is added to the Streets and Highways Code, to read: 27567. (a) No toll shall be imposed on the passage of a pedestrian or bicycle over any bridge that is under the jurisdiction of the district, on which the travel of pedestrians and bicycles is otherwise authorized. (b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2021, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2021, deletes or extends that date. SEC. 2. Section 30114 is added to the Streets and Highways Code, to read: 30114. (a) No toll shall be imposed on the passage of a pedestrian or bicycle over any state-owned bridge, on which the travel of pedestrians and bicycles is otherwise authorized, and on which tolls are imposed on the passage of motor vehicles. (b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2021, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2021, deletes or extends that date. SEC. 3. Section 30814 is added to the Streets and Highways Code, to read: 30814. (a) No toll shall be imposed on the passage of a pedestrian or bicycle over any bridge that is part of the state highway system, on which the travel of pedestrians and bicycles is otherwise authorized, and on which tolls are imposed on the passage of motor vehicles, including any bridge constructed pursuant to a franchise granted under this article. (b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2021, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2021, deletes or extends that date.