California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB40 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2015

Amended

Bill September 2, 2015
Bill April 15, 2015