|
09/27/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 683, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6446.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 4970.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 3427.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|