California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB488 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2016

Amended

Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 21, 2016
Bill March 31, 2016
Bill January 4, 2016
Bill April 14, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015