LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB488
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB488
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB488
Compare Versions
AB488 Chaptered September 27, 2016
AB488 Enrolled September 1, 2016
AB488 Amended August 2, 2016
AB488 Amended June 21, 2016
AB488 Amended March 31, 2016
AB488 Amended January 4, 2016
AB488 Amended April 14, 2015
AB488 Amended March 26, 2015
AB488 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB488 Chaptered September 27, 2016
AB488 Enrolled September 1, 2016
AB488 Amended August 2, 2016
AB488 Amended June 21, 2016
AB488 Amended March 31, 2016
AB488 Amended January 4, 2016
AB488 Amended April 14, 2015
AB488 Amended March 26, 2015
AB488 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare