|
01/15/2016
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2015
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 78. Page 3057.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 14. Page 2635.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 27. Page 1441.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|