LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB504
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB504
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB504
Compare Versions
AB504 Enrolled September 14, 2015
AB504 Amended September 4, 2015
AB504 Amended August 18, 2015
AB504 Amended June 24, 2015
AB504 Amended March 26, 2015
AB504 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB504 Enrolled September 14, 2015
AB504 Amended September 4, 2015
AB504 Amended August 18, 2015
AB504 Amended June 24, 2015
AB504 Amended March 26, 2015
AB504 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare