California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB504 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill August 18, 2015
Bill June 24, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015