Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Reconsideration granted. (Page 6544.) Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Bonta.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2015
|
Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. (Ayes 38. Noes 10. Page 3214.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Bonta.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 2706.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (September 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 1770.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|