LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB533
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB533
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB533
Compare Versions
AB533 Amended September 4, 2015
AB533 Amended August 18, 2015
AB533 Amended July 7, 2015
AB533 Amended April 23, 2015
AB533 Amended April 15, 2015
AB533 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB533 Amended September 4, 2015
AB533 Amended August 18, 2015
AB533 Amended July 7, 2015
AB533 Amended April 23, 2015
AB533 Amended April 15, 2015
AB533 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare