California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB533 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill August 18, 2015
Bill July 7, 2015
Bill April 23, 2015
Bill April 15, 2015