|
09/30/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 872, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6050.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5021.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3508.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21). Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2016
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3426.) From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 5). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/01/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|