LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB54
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB54
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB54
Compare Versions
AB54 Chaptered September 30, 2016
AB54 Enrolled August 23, 2016
AB54 Amended May 24, 2016
AB54 Amended January 13, 2016
AB54 Amended January 4, 2016
AB54 Amended April 22, 2015
AB54 Amended March 16, 2015
AB54 Amended February 18, 2015
AB54 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB54 Chaptered September 30, 2016
AB54 Enrolled August 23, 2016
AB54 Amended May 24, 2016
AB54 Amended January 13, 2016
AB54 Amended January 4, 2016
AB54 Amended April 22, 2015
AB54 Amended March 16, 2015
AB54 Amended February 18, 2015
AB54 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare