California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB54 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2016

Amended

Bill May 24, 2016
Bill January 13, 2016
Bill January 4, 2016
Bill April 22, 2015
Bill March 16, 2015
Bill February 18, 2015