|
10/10/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 727, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 2144.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 1552.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|