California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB547 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2015

Amended

Bill May 18, 2015
Bill April 29, 2015
Bill March 19, 2015