LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB547
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB547
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB547
Compare Versions
AB547 Chaptered October 10, 2015
AB547 Enrolled August 27, 2015
AB547 Amended May 18, 2015
AB547 Amended April 29, 2015
AB547 Amended March 19, 2015
AB547 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB547 Chaptered October 10, 2015
AB547 Enrolled August 27, 2015
AB547 Amended May 18, 2015
AB547 Amended April 29, 2015
AB547 Amended March 19, 2015
AB547 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare