|
09/21/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 299, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2601.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1986.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1448.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|