California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB556 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2015

Amended

Bill June 19, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015
Bill March 19, 2015