LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB556
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB556
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB556
Compare Versions
AB556 Chaptered September 21, 2015
AB556 Enrolled August 31, 2015
AB556 Amended June 19, 2015
AB556 Amended April 7, 2015
AB556 Amended March 19, 2015
AB556 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB556 Chaptered September 21, 2015
AB556 Enrolled August 31, 2015
AB556 Amended June 19, 2015
AB556 Amended April 7, 2015
AB556 Amended March 19, 2015
AB556 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare