|
03/29/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 3, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 3975.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2016
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (March 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after March 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3172.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (February 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2016
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2015
|
Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2117.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1448.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|