LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB558
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB558
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB558
Compare Versions
AB558 Chaptered March 29, 2016
AB558 Enrolled March 17, 2016
AB558 Amended March 1, 2016
AB558 Amended February 10, 2016
AB558 Enrolled August 21, 2015
AB558 Amended March 26, 2015
AB558 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB558 Chaptered March 29, 2016
AB558 Enrolled March 17, 2016
AB558 Amended March 1, 2016
AB558 Amended February 10, 2016
AB558 Enrolled August 21, 2015
AB558 Amended March 26, 2015
AB558 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare