California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB558 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill March 17, 2016
Bill August 21, 2015

Chaptered

Bill March 29, 2016

Amended

Bill March 1, 2016
Bill February 10, 2016
Bill March 26, 2015