|
08/17/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 214, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 26. Page 2415.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 1903.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 26. Page 1385.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|