California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB566 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 21, 2015

Chaptered

Bill August 17, 2015

Amended

Bill June 17, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015