LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB566
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB566
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB566
Compare Versions
AB566 Chaptered August 17, 2015
AB566 Enrolled July 21, 2015
AB566 Amended June 17, 2015
AB566 Amended March 26, 2015
AB566 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB566 Chaptered August 17, 2015
AB566 Enrolled July 21, 2015
AB566 Amended June 17, 2015
AB566 Amended March 26, 2015
AB566 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare