|
09/28/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 738, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 5242.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2016
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Page 3521.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 3523.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2016
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Page 3496.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 3497.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (January 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|