LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB620
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB620
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB620
Compare Versions
AB620 Chaptered September 28, 2016
AB620 Enrolled August 24, 2016
AB620 Amended January 27, 2016
AB620 Amended January 5, 2016
AB620 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB620 Chaptered September 28, 2016
AB620 Enrolled August 24, 2016
AB620 Amended January 27, 2016
AB620 Amended January 5, 2016
AB620 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare