California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB620 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2016

Amended

Bill January 27, 2016
Bill January 5, 2016