|
07/13/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 74, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2140.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1549.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1343.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|