California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB627 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill June 29, 2015

Chaptered

Bill July 13, 2015

Amended

Bill June 16, 2015
Bill May 27, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015