LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB627
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB627
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB627
Compare Versions
AB627 Chaptered July 13, 2015
AB627 Enrolled June 29, 2015
AB627 Amended June 16, 2015
AB627 Amended May 27, 2015
AB627 Amended March 26, 2015
AB627 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB627 Chaptered July 13, 2015
AB627 Enrolled June 29, 2015
AB627 Amended June 16, 2015
AB627 Amended May 27, 2015
AB627 Amended March 26, 2015
AB627 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare