Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. (Ayes 31. Noes 37. Page 6585.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 5494.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 32. Page 3508.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/25/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 3474.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/19/2016
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Gonzalez.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2015
|
Reconsideration granted. (Page 1943.) Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Gonzalez.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 1903.) Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 29. Noes 34. Page 1928.). Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Gonzalez.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2015
|
Read second time. Amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/18/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/17/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|