LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB67
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB67
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB67
Compare Versions
AB67 Amended August 3, 2016
AB67 Amended June 14, 2016
AB67 Amended May 19, 2016
AB67 Amended January 25, 2016
AB67 Amended June 3, 2015
AB67 Amended June 2, 2015
AB67 Introduced December 17, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB67 Amended August 3, 2016
AB67 Amended June 14, 2016
AB67 Amended May 19, 2016
AB67 Amended January 25, 2016
AB67 Amended June 3, 2015
AB67 Amended June 2, 2015
AB67 Introduced December 17, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare