California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB67 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 17, 2014

Amended

Bill August 3, 2016
Bill June 14, 2016
Bill May 19, 2016
Bill January 25, 2016
Bill June 3, 2015
Bill June 2, 2015