|
06/30/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 29, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1491.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 854.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/01/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|