California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB7 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Enrolled

Bill June 19, 2015

Chaptered

Bill June 30, 2015

Amended

Bill April 7, 2015
Bill January 28, 2015