LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB7
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB7
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB7
Compare Versions
AB7 Chaptered June 30, 2015
AB7 Enrolled June 19, 2015
AB7 Amended April 7, 2015
AB7 Amended January 28, 2015
AB7 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB7 Chaptered June 30, 2015
AB7 Enrolled June 19, 2015
AB7 Amended April 7, 2015
AB7 Amended January 28, 2015
AB7 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare