|
07/16/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 120, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 2. Page 2170.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1615.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 3. Page 1556.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|