LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB715
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB715
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB715
Compare Versions
AB715 Chaptered July 16, 2015
AB715 Enrolled July 2, 2015
AB715 Amended June 23, 2015
AB715 Amended May 20, 2015
AB715 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB715 Chaptered July 16, 2015
AB715 Enrolled July 2, 2015
AB715 Amended June 23, 2015
AB715 Amended May 20, 2015
AB715 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare