California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB715 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 2, 2015

Chaptered

Bill July 16, 2015

Amended

Bill June 23, 2015
Bill May 20, 2015