|
01/15/2016
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/17/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 28. Page 2990.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 45. Noes 29. Page 3017.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 2567.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 28. Page 1917.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|