California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB787 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2015

Amended

Bill August 18, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015