LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB787
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB787
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB787
Compare Versions
AB787 Enrolled September 11, 2015
AB787 Amended August 18, 2015
AB787 Amended June 1, 2015
AB787 Amended April 20, 2015
AB787 Amended March 26, 2015
AB787 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB787 Enrolled September 11, 2015
AB787 Amended August 18, 2015
AB787 Amended June 1, 2015
AB787 Amended April 20, 2015
AB787 Amended March 26, 2015
AB787 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare