|
09/21/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 432, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 13. Page 6385.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 5306.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leno.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 13. Page 1843.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|