California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB801 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2016

Amended

Bill August 17, 2016
Bill May 9, 2016
Bill September 3, 2015
Bill September 1, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015