LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB801
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB801
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB801
Compare Versions
AB801 Chaptered September 21, 2016
AB801 Enrolled August 30, 2016
AB801 Amended August 17, 2016
AB801 Amended May 9, 2016
AB801 Amended September 3, 2015
AB801 Amended September 1, 2015
AB801 Amended June 1, 2015
AB801 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB801 Chaptered September 21, 2016
AB801 Enrolled August 30, 2016
AB801 Amended August 17, 2016
AB801 Amended May 9, 2016
AB801 Amended September 3, 2015
AB801 Amended September 1, 2015
AB801 Amended June 1, 2015
AB801 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare